Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Agostino Marliani

Deceased

Bishop of Reggio Emilia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1585¹BornGenova
15 Jul 164560.5AppointedBishop of Accia and Mariana, France
1656²71.0ResignedBishop of Accia and Mariana, France
27 Feb 166277.1AppointedBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy
4 Jun 167489.4DiedBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Agostino Marliani:
Bishop Giovanni Agostino Marliani (died ) Bishop of Reggio Emilia

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 232
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1645, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 29 Mar 2015