Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco de Marchi

Deceased

Bishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1610¹Born
21 Jun 166050.4AppointedBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia
27 Jun 166050.4Ordained BishopBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia
1 Nov 166757.8DiedBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco de Marchi
Bishop Francesco de Marchi (born 1610, died ) Bishop of Krk (Veglia)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSplit

  • a bishop for 7.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 122, Number 747
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 361
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1660, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast