Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Maria Annoni, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Muro Lucano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1610¹BornMilano
21 Jun 166050.4AppointedBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy
27 Jun 166050.4Ordained BishopBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy
12 May 1674³64.3DiedBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Maria Annoni:
Bishop Francesco Maria Annoni C.R. (died ) Bishop of Muro Lucano

  • a bishop for 13.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 122, Number 747
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 250
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1660, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 7 Apr 2015