Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Michelangelo Cardinal Tonti

Deceased

Archbishop (Personal Title) of Cesena

Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli

Archpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Dec 1566²BornRimini
5 Nov 160841.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nazareth
16 Nov 160841.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nazareth
24 Nov 160841.9Elevated to Cardinal
10 Dec 160842.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Bartolomeo all’Isola
11 Mar 160942.2AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Cesena, Italy
161144.0AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}
13 Oct 162154.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
21 Apr 162255.3DiedBishop of Cesena, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michelangelo Tonti:
Michelangelo Cardinal Tonti (died ) Archbishop (Personal Title) of Cesena

  • a bishop for 13.4 years
  • a cardinal for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 Nov 1608
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 127, and Page 254
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 45, Number 240
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 144
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1608, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 9 Feb 2015