Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Matteo di Génnaro

Deceased

Archbishop of Reggio Calabria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1621¹BornNapoli
5 Apr 166039.2AppointedArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy
11 Apr 166039.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy
21 Jan 167453.0DiedArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Matteo di Génnaro:
Archbishop Matteo di Génnaro (died ) Archbishop of Reggio Calabria

  • a bishop for 13.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 122, Number 745
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 294
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1660, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 7 Apr 2015