Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Angelucci

Deceased

Bishop of Veroli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1615¹BornCastello del Poggio della Croce
13 Jul 163621.5Ordained PriestPriest
5 Apr 166045.3AppointedBishop of Veroli, Italy
11 Apr 166045.3Ordained BishopBishop of Veroli, Italy
15 Dec 167460.0DiedBishop of Veroli, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Angelucci:
Bishop Francesco Angelucci (died ) Bishop of Veroli

  • a priest for 38.4 years
  • a bishop for 14.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 122, Number 745
  • Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 365

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013