Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kevin Michael Manning

Bishop Emeritus of Parramatta, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1933 Born
20 Dec 196128.1Ordained PriestPriest of Bathurst, Australia
26 Apr 199157.4AppointedBishop of Armidale, Australia
10 Jul 199157.6Ordained BishopBishop of Armidale, Australia
10 Jul 199763.6AppointedBishop of Parramatta, Australia
21 Aug 199763.8InstalledBishop of Parramatta, Australia
8 Jan 201076.1RetiredBishop of Parramatta, Australia
30 Dec 201077.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Wilcannia-Forbes, Australia
1 Dec 201279.0CeasedApostolic Administrator of Wilcannia-Forbes, Australia

MicroData Summary for Kevin Michael Manning
Bishop Kevin Michael Manning (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Parramatta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCoolah

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Parramatta.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127, Number 11,456
  • r: CB, 17 Dec 2012
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018