Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop David Louis Walker

Bishop Emeritus of Broken Bay, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Nov 1938 Born
21 Jul 196223.6Ordained PriestPriest of Sydney, Australia
9 Jul 199657.6AppointedBishop of Broken Bay, Australia
3 Sep 199657.8Ordained BishopBishop of Broken Bay, Australia
13 Nov 201375.0RetiredBishop of Broken Bay, Australia

MicroData Summary for David Louis Walker
Bishop David Louis Walker (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Broken Bay

EventPlace
Birth PlaceClovelly

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Broken Bay.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,785
  • r: Bollettino, 13 Nov 2013
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast