Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Adrian Leo Doyle

Archbishop Emeritus of Hobart


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Nov 1936 BornHobart
20 Dec 196125.0Ordained PriestPriest of Hobart, Australia
10 Nov 199760.9AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Hobart, Australia
6 Feb 199861.2Ordained BishopCoadjutor Archbishop of Hobart, Australia
26 Jul 199962.6SucceededArchbishop of Hobart, Australia
26 Aug 199962.7InstalledArchbishop of Hobart, Australia
19 Jul 201376.6RetiredArchbishop of Hobart, Australia

MicroData Summary for Adrian Leo Doyle:
Archbishop Adrian Leo Doyle (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Hobart

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Hobart.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Number 13,236
  • r: Bollettino, 19 Jul 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015