Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Rossino

Deceased

Secretary of the Congregation of Seminaries and Universities

Titular Archbishop of Thessalonica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1880BornRobella di Trino, Italy
20 Jul 190222.5Ordained PriestPriest
28 Mar 193151.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thessalonica
19 Apr 193151.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Thessalonica
9 Mar 194666.2AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of Seminaries and Universities
31 Dec 194970.0DiedTitular Archbishop of Thessalonica

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Rossino:
Archbishop Giuseppe Rossino (born , died ) Secretary of Seminaries and Universities

  • a priest for 47.4 years
  • a bishop for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1931, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013