Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Grassi Fonseca

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Fermo, Italy

Titular Bishop of Aulon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 May 1819Born
26 Aug 187354.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Fermo, Italy
26 Aug 187354.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Aulon
28 Sep 187354.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aulon
4 Jan 188868.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Fermo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Grassi Fonseca
Bishop Francesco Grassi Fonseca (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Fermo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceForce, Archdiocese of Fermo
Ordained BishopCathedral, Fermo, Archdiocese of Fermo

  • a bishop for 14.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 132
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1873, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast