Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Mahuza Yava, S.D.S.

Vicar Apostolic of Archipelago of the Comores

Titular Bishop of Apisa Maius


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jul 1960 Born
8 Sep 199131.1Perpetual VowsMember of Society of the Divine Savior
8 May 199332.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Savior
1 May 201049.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Archipelago of the Comores
1 May 201049.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Apisa Maius
19 Jun 201049.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Apisa Maius

MicroData Summary for Charles Mahuza Yava
Bishop Charles Mahuza Yava S.D.S. (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Archipelago of the Comores

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSandoa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Archipelago of the Comores.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 May 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Number 16,660

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018