Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hermínio Malzone Hugo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Governador Valadares, Minas Gerais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1915BornGuaxupé
27 Mar 193823.1Ordained PriestPriest of Guaxupé, Minas Gerais, Brazil
29 Jan 195741.9AppointedBishop of Governador Valadares, Minas Gerais, Brazil
5 May 195742.2Ordained BishopBishop of Governador Valadares, Minas Gerais, Brazil
7 Dec 197762.8ResignedBishop of Governador Valadares, Minas Gerais, Brazil
20 Feb 200287.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Governador Valadares, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Hermínio Malzone Hugo:
Bishop Hermínio Malzone Hugo (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Governador Valadares

  • a priest for 63.9 years
  • a bishop for 44.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013