Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Settimio Quadraroli

Deceased

Bishop of Teramo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1871BornBelforte del Chienti
16 Oct 189524.0Ordained PriestPriest of Camerino, Italy
26 Aug 192149.8AppointedBishop of Teramo, Italy
6 Nov 192150.0Ordained BishopBishop of Teramo, Italy
4 Aug 192755.8DiedBishop of Teramo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Settimio Quadraroli:
Bishop Settimio Quadraroli (born , died ) Bishop of Teramo

  • a priest for 31.8 years
  • a bishop for 5.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 10,005
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1928
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 82
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013