Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stanislaus Joseph Brzana

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ogdensburg, New York, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1917Born
7 Jun 194123.9Ordained PriestPriest of Buffalo, New York, USA
24 May 196446.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Buffalo, New York, USA
24 May 196446.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Cufruta
29 Jun 196446.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cufruta
22 Oct 196851.2AppointedBishop of Ogdensburg, New York, USA
11 Nov 199376.3RetiredBishop of Ogdensburg, New York, USA
1 Mar 199779.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Ogdensburg, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Stanislaus Joseph Brzana (VIAF: 13971514)
Bishop Stanislaus Joseph Brzana (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ogdensburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuffalo, Diocese of Buffalo, New York
Ordained PriestBuffalo, Diocese of Buffalo, New York

  • a priest for 55.7 years
  • a bishop for 32.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)
  • c1: CB, 11 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast