Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antônio Soares Costa

Deceased

Bishop of Caruaru, Pernambuco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jun 1930BornNova Cruz
8 Dec 195525.5Ordained PriestPriest of Natal, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil
25 Nov 197141.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Natal, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil
25 Nov 197141.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Synnada in Mauretania
6 Feb 197241.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Synnada in Mauretania
27 Oct 199363.4AppointedBishop of Caruaru, Pernambuco, Brazil
7 Jun 200272.0DiedBishop of Caruaru, Pernambuco, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Antônio Soares Costa:
Bishop Antônio Soares Costa (born , died ) Bishop of Caruaru

  • a priest for 46.5 years
  • a bishop for 30.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013