Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Ruy Gonçalves Lopes, O.F.M. Cap.

Bishop of Caruaru, Pernambuco, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1967 Born
10 Jan 198820.4ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
5 Dec 199326.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
4 Jul 201244.9AppointedBishop of Jequié, Bahia, Brazil
7 Sep 201245.0Ordained BishopBishop of Jequié, Bahia, Brazil
13 Oct 201245.1InstalledBishop of Jequié, Bahia, Brazil
10 Jul 201951.9AppointedBishop of Caruaru, Pernambuco, Brazil
21 Sep 201952.1InstalledBishop of Caruaru, Pernambuco, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Ruy Gonçalves Lopes
Bishop José Ruy Gonçalves Lopes O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Bishop of Caruaru

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFeira di Santana, Diocese of Feira de Santana, Bahia
Ordained BishopNossa Senhora da Conceição da Praia, Basilica, Salvador, Archdiocese of São Salvador da Bahia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Caruaru.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Jul 2012
  • ob/c2: CB, 4 Jul 2012
  • c34: CB, 8 Aug 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,534
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Jul 2019
  • i: AM, 29 Jul 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast