Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste-Auguste de Villoutreix de Faye

Deceased

Bishop of Oloron (Oloron-Sainte-Marie)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1739BornLimousin
18 Jul 178343.7AppointedBishop of Oloron (Oloron-Sainte-Marie), France
17 Aug 178343.8Ordained BishopBishop of Oloron (Oloron-Sainte-Marie), France
12 Mar 179252.4DiedBishop of Oloron (Oloron-Sainte-Marie), France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste-Auguste de Villoutreix de Faye:
Bishop Jean-Baptiste-Auguste de Villoutreix de Faye (born , died ) Bishop of Oloron (Oloron-Sainte-Marie)

  • a bishop for 8.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013