Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine-Eustache d’Osmond

Deceased

Bishop of Nancy, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1754Born
20 Feb 178531.0SelectedBishop of (Saint-Bertrand de) Comminges, France
11 Apr 178531.1ConfirmedBishop of (Saint-Bertrand de) Comminges, France
1 May 178531.2Ordained BishopBishop of (Saint-Bertrand de) Comminges, France
26 Sep 180147.6ResignedBishop of (Saint-Bertrand de) Comminges, France
12 Apr 180248.1SelectedBishop of Nancy, France
15 Apr 180248.1ConfirmedBishop of Nancy, France
27 Sep 182369.6DiedBishop of Nancy, France

MicroData Summary for Antoine-Eustache d’Osmond
Bishop Antoine-Eustache d’Osmond (born , died ) Bishop of Nancy

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOuanaminthe, Haïti

  • a bishop for 38.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,023
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 275
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 181
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1785, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast