Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pierre-François-Martial de Loménie

Deceased

Coadjutor Archbishop of Sens, France

Titular Archbishop of Traianopolis in Rhodope


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jul 1763Born
25 Aug 178825.1SelectedCoadjutor Archbishop of Sens, France
15 Dec 178825.4ConfirmedCoadjutor Archbishop of Sens, France
15 Dec 178825.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Traianopolis in Rhodope
11 Jan 178925.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Traianopolis in Rhodope
10 May 179430.8DiedCoadjutor Archbishop of Sens, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre-François-Martial de Loménie
Archbishop Pierre-François-Martial de Loménie (born , died ) Coadjutor Archbishop of Sens

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarseille

  • a bishop for 5.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,789, Number 3
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 376, and Page 412

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast