Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Baptist Lee Keh-mien

Bishop of Hsinchu, Taiwan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Aug 1958 Born
27 May 199031.7Ordained PriestPriest of Hsinchu, Taiwan
6 Apr 200647.6AppointedBishop of Hsinchu, Taiwan
24 Jun 200647.8Ordained BishopBishop of Hsinchu, Taiwan

MicroData Summary for John Baptist Lee Keh-mien
Bishop John Baptist Lee Keh-mien (born ) Bishop of Hsinchu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTainan Hsien

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Hsinchu.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Apr 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,174

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast