Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Ionilton Lisboa de Oliveira, S.D.V.

Prelate of Itacoatiara, Amazonas, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Mar 1962 Born
21 Jan 199027.8ProfessedMember of Society of Divine Vocations
19 Jan 199229.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Divine Vocations
19 Apr 201755.1AppointedPrelate of Itacoatiara, Amazonas, Brazil
16 Jul 201755.3Ordained BishopPrelate of Itacoatiara, Amazonas, Brazil
30 Jul 201755.3InstalledPrelate of Itacoatiara, Amazonas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Ionilton Lisboa de Oliveira
Bishop José Ionilton Lisboa de Oliveira S.D.V. (born ) Prelate of Itacoatiara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAraci, Diocese of Feira de Santana, Bahia
Ordained BishopIn front of Nossa Senhora da Conceição do Raso, Araci, Archdiocese of Feira de Santana, Bahia

Please contact the Bishop through the Territorial Prelature of Itacoatiara.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Apr 2017
  • ob/i: CB, 24 Apr 2017
  • ob/c2: CB, 7 May 2017
  • c34: CB, 19 May 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jul 2017