Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Albert de Lezay-Marnesia

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Evreux


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1708BornLons-le-Saulnier
25 Apr 175951.2SelectedBishop of Evreux, France
24 Sep 175951.6ConfirmedBishop of Evreux, France
14 Oct 175951.6Ordained BishopBishop of Evreux, France
14 Jan 177465.9ResignedBishop of Evreux, France
4 Jun 179082.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Evreux, France

MicroData Summary for Louis-Albert de Lezay-Marnesia:
Bishop Louis-Albert de Lezay-Marnesia (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Evreux

  • a bishop for 30.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1759, Number 36
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 204

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 29 Nov 2015