Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexandre Lascaris de Vintimille

Deceased

Bishop of Toulon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1711¹BornLa Brigue
24 May 175948.3SelectedBishop of Toulon, France
13 Jul 175948.5ConfirmedBishop of Toulon, France
12 Sep 175948.6Ordained BishopBishop of Toulon, France
15 Mar 178675.2DiedBishop of Toulon, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alexandre Lascaris de Vintimille:
Bishop Alexandre Lascaris de Vintimille (born 1711, died ) Bishop of Toulon

  • a bishop for 26.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1759, Number 28
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 404

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 23 Nov 2015