Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Julian Leow Beng Kim

Archbishop of Kuala Lumpur


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1964 BornSeremban
20 Apr 200238.3Ordained PriestPriest of Kuala Lumpur, Malaysia
3 Jul 201450.5AppointedArchbishop of Kuala Lumpur, Malaysia
6 Oct 201450.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Kuala Lumpur, Malaysia

MicroData Summary for Julian Leow Beng Kim:
Archbishop Julian Leow Beng Kim (born ) Archbishop of Kuala Lumpur

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Kuala Lumpur.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Jul 2014
  • ob: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • c2+: CB, 4 Oct 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 6 Oct 2014