Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anthony Bernard Paul

Bishop of Melaka-Johor, Malaysia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1953 Born
21 Jul 198936.0Ordained PriestPriest of Penang, Malaysia
19 Nov 201562.3AppointedBishop of Melaka-Johor, Malaysia
12 Jan 201662.5Ordained BishopBishop of Melaka-Johor, Malaysia

MicroData Summary for Anthony Bernard Paul
Bishop Anthony Bernard Paul (born ) Bishop of Melaka-Johor

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlor Star

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Melaka-Johor.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Nov 2015
  • ob: CB, 19 Nov 2015
  • c2: CB, 8 Jan 2016
  • c34: CB, 12 Jan 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 226, Number 18,797

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 May 2017