Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José de Sousa Castelo Branco

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Funchal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1654³BornLeiria
21 Mar 168328.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
25 Mar 168328.3Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jan 169843.2AppointedBishop of Funchal, Portugal
29 Jun 169843.6Ordained BishopBishop of Funchal, Portugal
18 Feb 172570.2ResignedBishop of Funchal, Portugal
29 Jul 174691.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Funchal, Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José de Sousa Castelo Branco:
Bishop José de Sousa Castelo Branco (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Funchal

  • a priest for 63.3 years
  • a bishop for 48.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 206
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1698, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 3 May 2015