Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jaime Antônio Schuck, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Cristalândia, Goias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1913BornTreverton, PA, USA
11 Jun 194027.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
25 Nov 195845.9AppointedPrelate of Cristalândia, Goias, Brazil
25 Nov 195845.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Avissa
24 Feb 195946.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Avissa
26 May 197865.4ResignedTitular Bishop of Avissa
11 May 198875.3RetiredPrelate of Cristalândia, Goias, Brazil
31 Jan 199380.0DiedPrelate Emeritus of Cristalândia, Goias, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Jaime Antônio Schuck:
Bishop Jaime Antônio Schuck O.F.M. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Cristalândia

  • a priest for 52.6 years
  • a bishop for 33.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • b/ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013