Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adolph Marx

Deceased

Bishop of Brownsville, Texas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1915BornCologne, Germany
2 May 194025.2Ordained PriestPriest of Corpus Christi, Texas, USA
6 Jul 195641.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Corpus Christi, Texas, USA
6 Jul 195641.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Citrus
9 Oct 195641.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Citrus
9 Jul 196550.4AppointedBishop of Brownsville, Texas, USA
2 Sep 196550.5InstalledBishop of Brownsville, Texas, USA
1 Nov 196550.7DiedBishop of Brownsville, Texas, USA

MicroData Summary for Adolph Marx:
Bishop Adolph Marx (born , died ) Bishop of Brownsville

  • a priest for 25.5 years
  • a bishop for 9.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1956, Number 87

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013