Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop Étienne Delcher] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of [Haute-Loire (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1732Born
28 Feb 179158.1SelectedBishop of [Haute-Loire (Constitutional), France]
3 Apr 179158.2Ordained BishopBishop of [Haute-Loire (Constitutional), France]
Oct 1801³68.7ResignedBishop of [Haute-Loire (Constitutional), France]
17 Aug 180673.6DiedBishop Emeritus of [Haute-Loire (Constitutional), France]

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Étienne Delcher (VIAF: 44407882)
Bishop Étienne Delcher (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Haute-Loire

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrioude
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceBrioude

  • a bishop for 15.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 14 Oct 2018

Quantcast