Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop Charles-François Dorlodot] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of [Mayenne (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Sep 1756Born
3 Oct 179842.0SelectedBishop of [Mayenne (Constitutional), France]
7 Apr 179942.5Ordained BishopBishop of [Mayenne (Constitutional), France]
1801²44.2ResignedBishop of [Mayenne (Constitutional), France]
3 Jan 181659.2DiedBishop Emeritus of [Mayenne (Constitutional), France]

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles-François Dorlodot
Bishop Charles-François Dorlodot (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mayenne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLachalade
Ordained BishopSaint-Vénérand, Church, Laval
Death PlaceBesançon

  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1799, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 14 Oct 2018

Quantcast