Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop Yves-Marie Audrein] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of [Finistère (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1741Born
22 Apr 179856.5SelectedBishop of [Finistère (Constitutional), France]
22 Jul 179856.7Ordained BishopBishop of [Finistère (Constitutional), France]
19 Nov 1800³59.0DiedBishop of [Finistère (Constitutional), France]

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Yves-Marie Audrein (VIAF: 61541140)
Bishop Yves-Marie Audrein (born , died ) Bishop of Finistère

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGouarec
Ordained BishopQuimper
Death PlaceKerfeunteun

  • a bishop for 2.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1798, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast