Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gérard Couturier

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Hauterive, Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1913Born
25 Mar 193825.2Ordained PriestPriest of Rimouski, Québec, Canada
27 Dec 195643.9AppointedBishop of Golfe St-Laurent, Québec, Canada
28 Feb 195744.1Ordained BishopBishop of Golfe St-Laurent, Québec, Canada
12 Mar 195744.1InstalledBishop of Golfe St-Laurent, Québec, Canada
7 Sep 197461.6ResignedBishop of Hauterive, Québec, Canada
2 Feb 199986.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Hauterive, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Gérard Couturier
Bishop Gérard Couturier (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Hauterive

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSt-Louis-du-Ha-Ha

  • a priest for 60.8 years
  • a bishop for 41.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast