Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carlo Minchiatti

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Benevento


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Dec 1915BornS. Valentino della Collina
3 Jul 193923.5Ordained PriestPriest
30 Aug 196953.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Aquino, Sora, e Pontecorvo, Italy
30 Aug 196953.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Vartana
9 Nov 196953.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vartana
29 May 197155.4AppointedBishop of Aquino, Sora, e Pontecorvo, Italy
6 Aug 198266.6AppointedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
25 Nov 199175.9RetiredArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
11 Apr 199680.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Benevento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Minchiatti:
Archbishop Carlo Minchiatti (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Benevento

  • a priest for 56.8 years
  • a bishop for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013