Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José de Talavera Gómez de Eugenio, O.S.H. †

Deceased

Bishop of Valladolid


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1664²BornNavalmoral de Pusa
20 Dec 167814.9Ordained PriestPriest of Orden de San Jerónimo
2 Sep 171652.6AppointedBishop of Valladolid, Spain
15 Nov 171652.8Ordained BishopBishop of Valladolid, Spain
5 Nov 172763.8DiedBishop of Valladolid, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José de Talavera Gómez de Eugenio:
Bishop José de Talavera Gómez de Eugenio O.S.H. (died ) Bishop of Valladolid

  • a priest for 48.8 years
  • a bishop for 10.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,064
  • bp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 34, Number 107

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015