Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Timothy Joseph Lyne

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Chicago, Illinois, USA

Titular Bishop of Vamalla


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1919Born
1 May 194324.1Ordained PriestPriest of Chicago, Illinois, USA
18 Oct 198364.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
18 Oct 198364.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Vamalla
13 Dec 198364.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vamalla
24 Jan 199575.8RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
25 Sep 201394.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Chicago, Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for Timothy Joseph Lyne
Bishop Timothy Joseph Lyne (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Chicago

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChicago

  • a priest for 70.3 years
  • a bishop for 29.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 3 Oct 2017