Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Fraser

Deceased

Bishop of Dunkeld, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1858Born
13 Aug 188224.0Ordained PriestPriest of Aberdeen, Scotland, Great Britain
14 May 191354.7AppointedBishop of Dunkeld, Scotland, Great Britain
25 May 191354.7Ordained BishopBishop of Dunkeld, Scotland, Great Britain
28 Mar 191455.6DiedBishop of Dunkeld, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Robert Fraser
Bishop Robert Fraser (born , died ) Bishop of Dunkeld

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKennethmont, Huntly, Aberdeenshire, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern District, Scotland
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceBishop's House, Dundee, Tayside, Diocese of Dunkeld, Scotland
Buried Place (Original)Balgay, Cemetery, Dundee, Tayside, Diocese of Dunkeld, Scotland

  • a priest for 31.6 years
  • a bishop for .8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1913, Number 26
  • loc: CL, 27 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 31 Mar 2018