Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edmund Joseph Reilly

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Brooklyn, New York, USA

Titular Bishop of Nepte


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1897Born
1 Apr 192225.0Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 195557.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brooklyn, New York, USA
15 Mar 195557.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Nepte
7 Jun 195558.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nepte
3 Nov 195861.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Brooklyn, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Edmund Joseph Reilly
Bishop Edmund Joseph Reilly (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Brooklyn

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCollege Point, NY

  • a priest for 36.5 years
  • a bishop for 3.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast