Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Kariuki Njiru

Bishop of Embu, Kenya


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Mar 1963 Born
1 Mar 199329.9Ordained PriestPriest of Embu, Kenya
9 May 200946.1AppointedBishop of Embu, Kenya
25 Jul 200946.3Ordained BishopBishop of Embu, Kenya

MicroData Summary for Paul Kariuki Njiru (VIAF: 7633662)
Bishop Paul Kariuki Njiru (born ) Bishop of Embu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKathunguri

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Embu.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,253

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018