Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Kim Son-Tae

Bishop of Jeonju {Chonju, Jeon Ju}, Korea (South)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Sep 1961 Born
20 Jan 198927.3Ordained PriestPriest of Jeonju {Chonju, Jeon Ju}, Korea (South)
14 Mar 201755.4AppointedBishop of Jeonju {Chonju, Jeon Ju}, Korea (South)
13 May 201755.6Ordained BishopBishop of Jeonju {Chonju, Jeon Ju}, Korea (South)

MicroData Summary for John Kim Son-Tae
Bishop John Kim Son-Tae (born ) Bishop of Jeonju {Chonju, Jeon Ju}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceYeosan-myeon, Vicariate Apostolic of Chonju
Ordained BishopGunsan Wolmi Gymnasium, Jeonju, Diocese of Jeonju {Chonju, Jeon Ju}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Jeonju {Chonju, Jeon Ju}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Mar 2017
  • ob: CB, 22 Mar 2017
  • c23: CB, 13 May 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 May 2017