Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Binay Kandulna

Bishop of Khunti, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1964 Born
23 Apr 199430.3Ordained PriestPriest of Khunti, India
10 Feb 200945.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ranchi, India
10 Feb 200945.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Auzegera
1 May 200945.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Auzegera
5 Mar 2012³48.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Khunti, India
30 Nov 201248.9AppointedBishop of Khunti, India

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Binay Kandulna
Bishop Binay Kandulna (born ) Bishop of Khunti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGondra

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Khunti.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Feb 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,165
  • aadm: CB, 6 Mar 2012
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 Nov 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast