Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josephus Markus (Josef) Kahn

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Gurk, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Apr 1839Born
19 Jul 186324.2Ordained PriestPriest of Gurk, Austria
10 Feb 188747.8SelectedBishop of Gurk, Austria
19 Mar 188747.9Ordained BishopBishop of Gurk, Austria
27 Mar 188747.9InstalledBishop of Gurk, Austria
28 Oct 191071.5ResignedBishop of Gurk, Austria
15 Feb 191575.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Gurk, Austria

MicroData Summary for Josephus Markus (Josef) Kahn (VIAF: 120307657)
Bishop Josephus Markus (Josef) Kahn (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Gurk

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDöllach, Diocese of Gurk
Ordained BishopCathedral, Salzburg, Archdiocese of Salzburg
Death PlaceTanzenberg

  • a priest for 51.5 years
  • a bishop for 27.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 296
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1887, Number 10
  • loc/i: CB, 1 Jan 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2019

Quantcast