Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph (Joy) Kalathiparambil

Secretary of the Pontifical Council for the Pastoral Care of Migrants and Itinerant People


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1952 BornVaduthala
13 Mar 197825.4Ordained PriestPriest of Verapoly, India
19 Apr 200249.5AppointedBishop of Calicut, India
19 May 200249.6Ordained BishopBishop of Calicut, India
22 Feb 201158.3AppointedSecretary of the Pontifical Council for the Pastoral Care of Migrants and Itinerant People
1 Jan 201764.2CeasedSecretary of the Pontifical Council for the Pastoral Care of Migrants and Itinerant People

MicroData Summary for Joseph (Joy) Kalathiparambil
Bishop Joseph (Joy) Kalathiparambil (born ) Secretary of Pastoral Care of Migrants and Itinerant People

Please contact the Bishop through the Pontifical Council for the Pastoral Care of Migrants and Itinerant People.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 167, Number 14,187

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 31 Aug 2016