Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Dominic Romuald Basil Athaide, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Agra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1909BornBandra
26 Mar 193223.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
29 Feb 195647.0AppointedArchbishop of Agra, India
20 May 195647.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Agra, India
26 Jun 198273.3DiedArchbishop of Agra, India

MicroData Summary for Dominic Romuald Basil Athaide:
Archbishop Dominic Romuald Basil Athaide O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Archbishop of Agra

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 26.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 4 May 2015