Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Marijan Oblak

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Zadar (Zara), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1919Born
5 Aug 194525.6Ordained PriestPriest of Zadar (Zara), Croatia
30 Apr 195838.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia
30 Apr 195838.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Flavias
6 Jul 195838.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Flavias
20 Aug 196949.6AppointedArchbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia
2 Feb 199676.1RetiredArchbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia
15 Feb 200888.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Zadar (Zara), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Marijan Oblak
Archbishop Marijan Oblak (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Zadar (Zara)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVeli Rat

  • a priest for 62.5 years
  • a bishop for 49.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast