Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ante Ivas

Bishop Emeritus of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Dec 1939 Born
5 Jul 196424.5Ordained PriestPriest
5 Feb 199757.1AppointedBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia
19 Mar 199757.2Ordained BishopBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia
3 Jun 201676.4RetiredBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Ante Ivas (VIAF: 305481084)
Bishop Ante Ivas (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Šibenik (Knin)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVodice

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Šibenik (Knin).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Number 12,941
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Jun 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast