Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ilija Janjić

Bishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1944 Born
29 Jun 196924.7Ordained PriestPriest of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro
11 Mar 199651.4AppointedBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro
27 Apr 199651.6Ordained BishopBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro

MicroData Summary for Ilija Janjić
Bishop Ilija Janjić (born ) Bishop of Kotor (Cattaro)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVidovice

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kotor (Cattaro).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,743

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast