Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Patrick Kavanagh

Deceased

Bishop of Dunedin, New Zealand


from Cathedral Web Site

Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Apr 1913Born
6 Sep 193623.3Ordained PriestPriest of Wellington, New Zealand
14 Jul 194936.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Dunedin, New Zealand
14 Jul 194936.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Algiza
30 Nov 194936.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Algiza
26 Dec 195744.6SucceededBishop of Dunedin, New Zealand
10 Jul 198572.1DiedBishop of Dunedin, New Zealand

MicroData Summary for John Patrick Kavanagh
Bishop John Patrick Kavanagh (born , died ) Bishop of Dunedin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHawera
Ordained PriestSt. Mary of the Angels, Church, Wellington, Archdiocese of Wellington
Ordained BishopSacred Heart, Basilica, Wellington, Archdiocese of Wellington
Death PlaceMater Misericordiae, Hospital, Dunedin, Diocese of Dunedin

  • a priest for 48.8 years
  • a bishop for 35.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1949, Number 105
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ab: Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 41, Page 584
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 70, Number 5,581

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast