Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Basil Meeking

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Christchurch, New Zealand


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1929Born
19 Jul 195323.6Ordained PriestPriest of Christchurch, New Zealand
30 Mar 198757.3AppointedBishop of Christchurch, New Zealand
3 Jun 198757.5Ordained BishopBishop of Christchurch, New Zealand
15 Dec 199566.0ResignedBishop of Christchurch, New Zealand
11 Jun 202090.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Christchurch, New Zealand

MicroData Summary for John Basil Meeking
Bishop John Basil Meeking (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Christchurch

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAshburton
Ordained BishopHoly Sacrament, Cathedral, Christchurch, Diocese of Christchurch
Death PlaceChristchurch, Hospital, Christchurch, Diocese of Error [Chri]

  • a priest for 66.8 years
  • a bishop for 33.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,253
  • d: CB, 10 Jun 2020
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 246, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 11 Apr 2021

Quantcast