Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Denis William Hanrahan

Deceased

Bishop of Christchurch


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1933BornGreymouth
21 Jul 195723.7Ordained PriestPriest of Christchurch, New Zealand
25 Mar 198450.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Christchurch, New Zealand
6 Jun 198450.5Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Christchurch, New Zealand
4 Jul 198551.6SucceededBishop of Christchurch, New Zealand
1 Feb 198753.2DiedBishop of Christchurch, New Zealand

MicroData Summary for Denis William Hanrahan:
Bishop Denis William Hanrahan (born , died ) Bishop of Christchurch

  • a priest for 29.5 years
  • a bishop for 2.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015